AL HB188 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 25 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 25 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Public K-12 education, creates uniform process for suspension and expulsion of public school students, requires disciplinary hearing following long-term suspension or expulsion, St. Bd. of Ed. required to adopt rules
Title
Public K-12 education, creates uniform process for suspension and expulsion of public school students, requires disciplinary hearing following long-term suspension or expulsion, St. Bd. of Ed. required to adopt rules
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-25 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Roll Call 760 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - Senate - Smitherman motion to Adopt - Roll Call 759 VAEBPLL-1 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Second House (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Roll Call 414 (Y: 96 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - House - Motion to Adopt - Roll Call 413 AJPGSS7-1 (Y: 95 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - House - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 94 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - Senate - Smitherman motion to Adopt - Roll Call 759 VAEBPLL-1 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Second House (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Roll Call 414 (Y: 96 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - House - Motion to Adopt - Roll Call 413 AJPGSS7-1 (Y: 95 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - House - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 94 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | Enrolled |
2024-04-25 | House | Ready to Enroll |
2024-04-25 | House | Ready to Enroll |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 760 |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Smitherman motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 759 VAEBPLL-1 |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Education Policy 1st Amendment Offered VAEBPLL-1 |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Third Reading in Second House |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee Second House |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Education Policy 1st Amendment VAEBPLL-1 |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Pending Senate Education Policy |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Education Policy |
2024-04-04 | House | Engrossed |
2024-04-04 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 414 |
2024-04-04 | House | Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 413 AJPGSS7-1 |
2024-04-04 | House | Education Policy 1st Substitute Offered AJPGSS7-1 |
2024-04-04 | House | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-03-21 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-03-20 | House | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-03-20 | House | Education Policy 1st Substitute AJPGSS7-1 |
2024-02-15 | House | Pending House Education Policy |
2024-02-15 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Education Policy |