AL HB190 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-09 - Delivered to Governor at 3:33 p.m. on May 9, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-09 - Delivered to Governor at 3:33 p.m. on May 9, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriations, supplemental appropriations for fiscal year ending September 30, 2020, from the Education Trust Fund Advancement and Technology Fund to various school systems and colleges and universities, and other entities
Title
Appropriations, supplemental appropriations for fiscal year ending September 30, 2020, from the Education Trust Fund Advancement and Technology Fund to various school systems and colleges and universities, and other entities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-09 - House - Poole motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 70 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 32) [PASS]
2020-05-09 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-05-09 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-05-07 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 75 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 29) [PASS]
2020-05-07 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 74 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 30) [PASS]
2020-05-09 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-05-09 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-05-07 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 75 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 29) [PASS]
2020-05-07 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 74 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 30) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-09 | House | Delivered to Governor at 3:33 p.m. on May 9, 2020. |
2020-05-09 | House | Assigned Act No. 2020-154. |
2020-05-09 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2020-05-09 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2020-05-09 | Senate | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2020-05-09 | House | Poole motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 574 |
2020-05-09 | House | Concurrence Requested |
2020-05-09 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 715 |
2020-05-09 | House | Enrolled |
2020-05-09 | Senate | Orr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 714 |
2020-05-09 | Senate | Orr first Substitute Offered |
2020-05-09 | Senate | Orr motion to Table adopted Voice Vote |
2020-05-09 | Senate | Finance and Taxation Education first Substitute Offered |
2020-05-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2020-05-08 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education |
2020-05-07 | House | Engrossed |
2020-05-07 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 457 |
2020-05-07 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 456 |
2020-05-07 | House | Ways and Means Education first Substitute Offered |
2020-05-07 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2020-05-05 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2020-02-06 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education |