AL HB220 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-04 - Pending third reading on day 19 Favorable from Banking and Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-04 - Pending third reading on day 19 Favorable from Banking and Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Surplus line insurance, foreign and alien insurers, requirement for transacting insurance for minimum of five years in its state or country of domicile, exception under certain conditions, Sec. 27-10-26 am'd.
Title
Surplus line insurance, foreign and alien insurers, requirement for transacting insurance for minimum of five years in its state or country of domicile, exception under certain conditions, Sec. 27-10-26 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-04 | Pending third reading on day 19 Favorable from Banking and Insurance | |
2010-03-04 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-02-25 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Banking and Insurance | |
2010-02-16 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 274 | |
2010-02-16 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-01-28 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-01-12 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Banking and Insurance |