AL HB220 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-08 - Assigned Act No. 2018-100.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-08 - Assigned Act No. 2018-100.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Henry Co., coroner, employment benefits provided
Title
Henry Co., coroner, employment benefits provided
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-08 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 71 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2018-01-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 71 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-08 | House | Assigned Act No. 2018-100. |
2018-02-08 | House | Forwarded to Governor on February 8, 2018 at 1:04 p.m. on February 8, 2018. |
2018-02-08 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2018-02-08 | House | Enrolled |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2018-02-08 | House | Passed Second House |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 329 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2018-01-23 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 61 |
2018-01-23 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2018-01-18 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-01-16 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |