AL HB244 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-23 - Pending third reading on day 25 Favorable from Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-23 - Pending third reading on day 25 Favorable from Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Animals, required rabies vaccines for certain canidae and felidae, further provided for, possession of certain large felidae, wolves, or bears, prohibited under certain conditions, minimum caging requirements, penalties, Secs. 3-8-1 am'd; Sec. 3-8-2 added.
Title
Animals, required rabies vaccines for certain canidae and felidae, further provided for, possession of certain large felidae, wolves, or bears, prohibited under certain conditions, minimum caging requirements, penalties, Secs. 3-8-1 am'd; Sec. 3-8-2 added.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Ball [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 75 N: 9 NV: 15 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 81 N: 6 NV: 9 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 81 N: 6 NV: 9 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-23 | Senate | Pending third reading on day 25 Favorable from Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry |
2019-04-25 | House | Engrossed |
2019-04-25 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 390 |
2019-04-25 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 389 |
2019-04-25 | House | McMillan Amendment Offered |
2019-04-25 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 388 |
2019-04-25 | House | Agriculture and Forestry first Substitute Offered |
2019-04-25 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-11 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2019-03-20 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Agriculture and Forestry |