AL HB287 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-26 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-26 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to crimes and offenses; to create the crime of doxing; to establish penalties for violations; and in connection therewith would have as its purpose or effect the requirement of a new or increased expenditure of local funds within the meaning of Section 111.05 of the Constitution of Alabama of 2022.
Title
Relating to crimes and offenses; to create the crime of doxing; to establish penalties for violations; and in connection therewith would have as its purpose or effect the requirement of a new or increased expenditure of local funds within the meaning of Section 111.05 of the Constitution of Alabama of 2022.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-26 - House - Concur In and Adopt (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - Senate - Read A Third Time And Passed As Amended (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - Senate - Adopt TSS819-1 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - House - Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - House - Adopt F6SID5-1 (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - House - Adopt 5EL0MM-1 (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - Senate - Read A Third Time And Passed As Amended (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - Senate - Adopt TSS819-1 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - House - Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - House - Adopt F6SID5-1 (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - House - Adopt 5EL0MM-1 (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-26 | House | Enacted |
2023-05-26 | House | Enrolled |
2023-05-26 | House | Concur In and Adopt |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Read A Third Time And Passed As Amended |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Adopt TSS819-1 |
2023-05-25 | Senate | On Third Reading in Second House |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Read Second Time in Second House |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee in Second House |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Reported Favorably from Senate Judiciary |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee to Senate Judiciary |
2023-05-11 | House | Read First Time in Second House |
2023-05-09 | House | Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended |
2023-05-09 | House | Adopt F6SID5-1 |
2023-05-09 | House | Adopt 5EL0MM-1 |
2023-05-09 | House | On Third Reading in House of Origin |
2023-04-27 | House | Read Second Time in House of Origin |
2023-04-26 | House | Reported Out of Committee in House of Origin |
2023-04-26 | House | Reported Favorably from House Judiciary |
2023-04-26 | House | Amendment/Substitute by House Judiciary 5EL0MM-1 |
2023-04-25 | House | Amendment/Substitute by House Judiciary GVAK22-1 |
2023-04-11 | House | Introduced and Referred to House Judiciary |
2023-04-11 | House | Read First Time in House of Origin |