AL HB302 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Statewide Constitutional Amendment, to grant school lands in Fayette and Walker Co.s to Franklin Co. Board of Education.
Title
Statewide Constitutional Amendment, to grant school lands in Fayette and Walker Co.s to Franklin Co. Board of Education.
Sponsors
Rep. Jamie Kiel [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-09 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Roll Call 483 (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 29 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - House - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 25 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - House - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 25 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee Second House |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Pending Senate Agriculture, Conservation, and Forestry |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Conservation, and Forestry |
2024-04-09 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 483 |
2024-04-09 | House | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-03-21 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-03-20 | House | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-03-06 | House | Pending House Agriculture and Forestry |
2024-03-06 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Agriculture and Forestry |