AL HB306 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Pending Senate Local Legislation
Pending: Senate Local Legislation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Pending Senate Local Legislation
Pending: Senate Local Legislation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Baldwin County, constitutional amendment, creates the Stapleton Landmark District
Title
Baldwin County, constitutional amendment, creates the Stapleton Landmark District
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-16 - House - LocalCertificationResolutionAdopted (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 21 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Roll Call 581 (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 37 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 30 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Roll Call 581 (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 37 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 30 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | Senate | Pending Senate Local Legislation |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Local Legislation |
2024-04-16 | House | LocalCertificationResolutionAdopted |
2024-04-16 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 581 |
2024-04-16 | House | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-04-11 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-10 | House | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-03-07 | House | Pending House Baldwin County Legislation |
2024-03-07 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Baldwin County Legislation |