AL HB393 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Delivered to Governor at 10:01 a.m. on May 16, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Motor vehicle dealer licensing, master regulatory dealer license, provided, wholesale motor vehicle auction license provided, Secs. 40-12-445 to 40-12-450, inclusive, added; Secs. 40-12-264, 40-12-390 to 40-12-393, incl., 40-12-395, 40-12-398 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor vehicle dealer licensing, master regulatory dealer license, provided, wholesale motor vehicle auction license provided, Secs. 40-12-445 to 40-12-450, inclusive, added; Secs. 40-12-264, 40-12-390 to 40-12-393, incl., 40-12-395, 40-12-398 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-15 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - Wood (R) motion to Table (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16HouseDelivered to Governor at 10:01 a.m. on May 16, 2019.
2019-05-16HouseAssigned Act No. 2019-244.
2019-05-16HouseClerk of the House Certification
2019-05-16SenateSignature Requested
2019-05-15HouseEnrolled
2019-05-15HousePassed Second House
2019-05-15SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 786
2019-05-15SenateThird Reading Passed
2019-05-02SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2019-04-25SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs
2019-04-23HouseEngrossed
2019-04-23HouseIngram filed conflict of interest delcaration
2019-04-23HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 327
2019-04-23HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 326
2019-04-23HouseWood (R) Amendment Offered
2019-04-23HouseWood (R) motion to Table adopted Roll Call 325
2019-04-23HouseState Government Amendment Offered
2019-04-23HouseThird Reading Passed
2019-04-18HouseActed on by State Government as Favorable with 1 amendment
2019-04-09HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=HB393&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/HB393-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/HB393-eng.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/199467-2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/199646-2.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=612307&VOTE=325&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=612309&VOTE=326&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=612310&VOTE=327&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=619467&VOTE=786&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback