AL HB393 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-04 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
Pending: Senate Local Legislation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-04 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
Pending: Senate Local Legislation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Colbert Co., license required to operate a community reentry program for individuals released from incarceration, co. commission authorized to establish additional licensing requirements, const. amend.
Title
Colbert Co., license required to operate a community reentry program for individuals released from incarceration, co. commission authorized to establish additional licensing requirements, const. amend.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - House - Motion to Local Application (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 62 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2020-03-12 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 33 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 33 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-04 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2020-03-12 | House | Rogers intended to vote "Nay" |
2020-03-12 | House | Motion to Local Application adopted Roll Call 301 |
2020-03-12 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 300 |
2020-03-12 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2020-03-10 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2020-03-05 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |