AL HB396 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Forwarded to Governor on May 23, 2019 at 1:08 p.m. on May 23, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Forwarded to Governor on May 23, 2019 at 1:08 p.m. on May 23, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Class 1 municipalities, industrial development boards, authorized to charge an administrative fee if granting a tax abatement, Sec. 11-54-101 am'd.
Title
Class 1 municipalities, industrial development boards, authorized to charge an administrative fee if granting a tax abatement, Sec. 11-54-101 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 87 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2019-05-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 87 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-23 | House | Forwarded to Governor on May 23, 2019 at 1:08 p.m. on May 23, 2019. |
2019-05-23 | House | Assigned Act No. 2019-321. |
2019-05-23 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2019-05-23 | House | Enrolled |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2019-05-23 | House | Passed Second House |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1047 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Jefferson County Legislation |
2019-05-16 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 794 |
2019-05-16 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-15 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-04-09 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Jefferson County Legislation |