AL HB479 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-02 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-02 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriations, supplemental appropriations from the Opioid Treatment and Abatement Fund for the fiscal year ending September 30, 2023
Title
Appropriations, supplemental appropriations from the Opioid Treatment and Abatement Fund for the fiscal year ending September 30, 2023
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-30 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Roll Call 921 (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - House - Motion to Adopt - Roll Call 920 8PEXFF2-1 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - House - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - House - Motion to Adopt - Roll Call 920 8PEXFF2-1 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - House - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-02 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee Second House |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Engrossed |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Pending Senate Finance and Taxation General Fund |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund |
2024-04-30 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 921 |
2024-04-30 | House | Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 920 8PEXFF2-1 |
2024-04-30 | House | Ways and Means General Fund Engrossed Substitute Offered 8PEXFF2-1 |
2024-04-30 | House | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-04-25 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-24 | House | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin from House Ways and Means General Fund 8PEXFF2-1 |
2024-04-24 | House | Ways and Means General Fund 1st Amendment ZJC4RWR-1 |
2024-04-23 | House | Pending House Ways and Means General Fund |
2024-04-23 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means General Fund |
Same As/Similar To
SB337 (Same As) 2024-04-30 - Pending House Ways and Means General Fund