AL HB540 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Forwarded to Governor on May 30, 2019 at 4:12 p.m. on May 30, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Taxation, incentives for attraction of new and expanding business including rural areas, investment credit for income tax, financial institution excise tax, insurance premium tax, utility tax, further incentives for rural areas as defined, purchase of credits, incentives for high-tech companies, Ala. Incentives Modernization Act, Secs. 40-18-6.1, 40-18-8.1, 40-18-376.3 added; Secs. 40-18-376, 40-18-376.1, 40-18-410, 40-18-411, 40-18-412, 40-18-413, 40-18-414 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Taxation, incentives for attraction of new and expanding business including rural areas, investment credit for income tax, financial institution excise tax, insurance premium tax, utility tax, further incentives for rural areas as defined, purchase of credits, incentives for high-tech companies, Ala. Incentives Modernization Act, Secs. 40-18-6.1, 40-18-8.1, 40-18-376.3 added; Secs. 40-18-376, 40-18-376.1, 40-18-410, 40-18-411, 40-18-412, 40-18-413, 40-18-414 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-30 - House - Poole motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Marsh motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Marsh motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Reed motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-30HouseForwarded to Governor on May 30, 2019 at 4:12 p.m. on May 30, 2019.
2019-05-30HouseAssigned Act No. 2019-392.
2019-05-30HouseClerk of the House Certification
2019-05-30HouseEnrolled
2019-05-30SenateSignature Requested
2019-05-30SenateConcurred in Second House Amendment
2019-05-30HousePoole motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1200
2019-05-30HouseConcurrence Requested
2019-05-29SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1353
2019-05-29SenateThird Reading Passed
2019-05-29SenateReed motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2019-05-29SenateMarsh motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1320
2019-05-29SenateMarsh Amendment Offered
2019-05-29SenateMarsh motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1319
2019-05-29SenateMarsh Amendment Offered
2019-05-29SenateReed motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1318
2019-05-29SenateFinance and Taxation Education Amendment Offered
2019-05-29SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2019-05-28SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2019-05-16SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education
2019-05-16HouseEngrossed
2019-05-16HouseMoore (M) intended to vote "Yea"
2019-05-16HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 807
2019-05-16HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 806
2019-05-16HousePoole Amendment Offered
2019-05-16HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 805
2019-05-16HouseWays and Means Education first Substitute Offered
2019-05-16HouseThird Reading Passed
2019-05-14HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2019-05-02HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=HB540&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/HB540-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/HB540-eng.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/HB540-enr.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/201085-2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/201484-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/202049-2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/202190-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/202175-3.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=620508&VOTE=805&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=620510&VOTE=806&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=620511&VOTE=807&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=625605&VOTE=1318&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=625629&VOTE=1319&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=625631&VOTE=1320&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=625806&VOTE=1353&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=626574&VOTE=1200&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback