TN SB0544 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the department to employ a guardian ad litem within each region of the state to advocate for each child who is in the custody of the department due to allegations of dependency and neglect and located within the region that the guardian ad litem serves; requires the guardians ad litem to review dependency and neglect cases of children who have been in the custody of the department for six months to determine whether termination of parental rights should be filed and, if so, file a petition within 30 days. - Amends TCA Title 36 and Title 37.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 36 and Title 37, relative to the department of children's services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-14 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2024 |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/15/2024 |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/20/2023 |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/14/2023 |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/14/2023 |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/13/2023 |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/14/2023 |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/21/2023 |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0759 (Crossfiled) 2023-04-18 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee