AL HB549 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-22 - Delivered to Governor at 4:25 p.m. on April 22, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-22 - Delivered to Governor at 4:25 p.m. on April 22, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicles, distinctive license tags, retired professional firefighter tag authorized, duties to Revenue Department, penalties
Title
Motor vehicles, distinctive license tags, retired professional firefighter tag authorized, duties to Revenue Department, penalties
Sponsors
Sen. Gerald Allen [R] | Rep. Jim Barton [R] | Rep. Jack Collier [R] | Rep. Chad Fincher [R] |
Rep. Victor Gaston [R] | Rep. James Ison [R] | Rep. Joseph Mitchell [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-22 | Delivered to Governor at 4:25 p.m. on April 22, 2010. | |
2010-04-22 | Assigned Act No. 2010-710. | |
2010-04-22 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2010-04-22 | Signature Requested | |
2010-04-22 | Enrolled | |
2010-04-22 | Passed Second House | |
2010-04-22 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1221 | |
2010-04-22 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-04-06 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-03-30 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs | |
2010-03-25 | Engrossed | |
2010-03-25 | McMillan, Mitchell intended to vote "Yea" | |
2010-03-25 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 675 | |
2010-03-25 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 674 | |
2010-03-25 | Public Safety first Substitute Offered | |
2010-03-25 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-02-25 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and | |
2010-02-11 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety |