AL HB611 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Delivered to Governor at 1:35 p.m. on May 30, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Delivered to Governor at 1:35 p.m. on May 30, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Baldwin Co., toll road and bridge authority, toll road from Beach Express to I-65, incorp. of authority, powers, issuance of revenue bonds
Title
Baldwin Co., toll road and bridge authority, toll road from Beach Express to I-65, incorp. of authority, powers, issuance of revenue bonds
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - House - McMillan motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 49 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Chambliss motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 83 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-05-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 75 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2019-05-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 74 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Chambliss motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 83 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-05-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 75 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2019-05-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 74 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-30 | House | Delivered to Governor at 1:35 p.m. on May 30, 2019. |
2019-05-30 | House | Assigned Act No. 2019-518. |
2019-05-30 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2019-05-30 | House | Enrolled |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2019-05-30 | House | McMillan motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1170 |
2019-05-30 | House | Concurrence Requested |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1315 |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Chambliss motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1314 |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Chambliss Amendment Offered |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-05-23 | House | Engrossed |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2019-05-23 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 903 |
2019-05-23 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 902 |
2019-05-23 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 901 |
2019-05-23 | House | Baldwin County Legislation 2nd Amendment Offered |
2019-05-23 | House | Baldwin County Legislation 1st Amendment Offered |
2019-05-23 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-22 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 2 amendments |
2019-05-14 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Baldwin County Legislation |