AL HJR15 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - Assigned Act No. 2018-58.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - Assigned Act No. 2018-58.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Tracy Sanders Memorial Highway, portion of State Highway 77 in Calhoun Co., named
Title
Tracy Sanders Memorial Highway, portion of State Highway 77 in Calhoun Co., named
Sponsors
Rep. Randy Wood [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | House | Assigned Act No. 2018-58. |
2018-02-01 | House | Delivered to Governor at 1:59 p.m. on February 1, 2018. |
2018-02-01 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2018-02-01 | House | Enrolled |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2018-02-01 | House | Passed Second House |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Waggoner motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Reported from Rules |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Received in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules |
2018-01-11 | House | Jones motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2018-01-11 | House | Reported from Rules |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules |