AL HJR15 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Delivered to Governor at 2:47 p.m. on May 8, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Taylor, Theoplus Jefferson, death mourned

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Taylor, Theoplus Jefferson, death mourned

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-07 - Senate - Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - House - Warren motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-08HouseDelivered to Governor at 2:47 p.m. on May 8, 2019.
2019-05-08HouseAssigned Act No. 2019-172.
2019-05-08HouseClerk of the House Certification
2019-05-08SenateSignature Requested
2019-05-07HouseEnrolled
2019-05-07HouseSecond House Concurs in Executive Amendment
2019-05-07SenateMarsh motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 646
2019-05-07SenateHouse of Origin Concurs in Executive Amendment
2019-05-07HouseWarren motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 536
2019-05-07HouseExecutive Amendment Offered
2019-05-07HouseForwarded to Governor
2019-04-04HouseClerk of the House Certification
2019-04-04HouseEnrolled
2019-04-04SenateSignature Requested
2019-04-03HousePassed Second House
2019-04-03SenateWaggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote
2019-04-03SenateReported from Rules
2019-04-02SenateReceived in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules
2019-03-21HouseJones (M) motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote
2019-03-21HouseReported from Rules
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback