AL SB145 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Sunset law; Alabama Board of Examiners in Counseling continued until October 1, 2026
Title
Sunset law; Alabama Board of Examiners in Counseling continued until October 1, 2026
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-29 - Senate - Passed House Of Origin (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Third Reading House of Origin (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Third Reading House of Origin (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-03-20 | House | Reported Out of Committee Second House |
2024-03-05 | House | Pending House Boards, Agencies and Commissions |
2024-03-05 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 149 |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Pending Senate Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |