AL SB211 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Public K-12 education, remote early enrollment of transferring military children with special needs
Title
Public K-12 education, remote early enrollment of transferring military children with special needs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Roll Call 278 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-17 | House | Reported Out of Committee Second House |
2024-04-03 | House | Pending House Military and Veterans Affairs |
2024-04-03 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Military and Veterans Affairs |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 278 |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Pending Senate Veterans and Military Affairs |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Veterans and Military Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB292 (Same As) 2024-04-25 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar