AL SB254 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Assigned Act No. 2019-386.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Motor vehicles, seat belt use required for each occupant while vehicle is in motion, Secs. 32-5B-4 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor vehicles, seat belt use required for each occupant while vehicle is in motion, Secs. 32-5B-4 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-30 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 76 N: 17 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Singleton motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Singleton motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-30SenateAssigned Act No. 2019-386.
2019-05-30SenateDelivered to Governor at 2:12 p.m. on May 30, 2019
2019-05-30SenateEnrolled
2019-05-30HouseSignature Requested
2019-05-30SenatePassed Second House
2019-05-30HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1194
2019-05-30HouseThird Reading Passed
2019-05-23HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2019-05-21HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security
2019-05-21SenateEngrossed
2019-05-21SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 918
2019-05-21SenateSingleton motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 917
2019-05-21SenateSingleton motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 916
2019-05-21SenateTransportation and Energy Amendment Offered
2019-05-21SenateTransportation and Energy first Substitute Offered
2019-05-21SenateThird Reading Passed
2019-04-18SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and 1 amendment
2019-04-09SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Transportation and Energy

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=SB254&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/SB254-int.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/199581-2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/199458-2.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=621053&VOTE=916&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=621054&VOTE=917&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=621056&VOTE=918&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=626506&VOTE=1194&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback