AL SB268 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Mobile County, sheriff, qualifications
Title
Mobile County, sheriff, qualifications
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-18 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Roll Call 647 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - Senate - Motion to Adopt - Roll Call 646 FXITCDC-1 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - Senate - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - Senate - Motion to Adopt - Roll Call 646 FXITCDC-1 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - Senate - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-25 | House | Reported Out of Committee Second House from House Mobile County Legislation TFFG591-1 |
2024-04-25 | House | Mobile County Legislation 1st Amendment UFFQDXG-1 |
2024-04-23 | House | Pending House Mobile County Legislation |
2024-04-23 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Mobile County Legislation |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Engrossed |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 647 |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 646 FXITCDC-1 |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Mobile County Legislation 1st Amendment Offered FXITCDC-1 |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Mobile County Legislation 1st Amendment FXITCDC-1 |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Pending Senate Mobile County Legislation |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Mobile County Legislation |