AL SB289 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-26 - Assigned Act No. 2014-105.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-26 - Assigned Act No. 2014-105.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Federal Aid Highway Finance Authority, membership, gasoline tax revenues pledged to secure bonds of authority, parity of pledge provided, investments further provided for, Secs. 23-1-181, 23-1-301, 23-1-305, 23-1-309, 23-1-311, 23-1-313, 23-1-314, 23-1-315 am'd.
Title
Federal Aid Highway Finance Authority, membership, gasoline tax revenues pledged to secure bonds of authority, parity of pledge provided, investments further provided for, Secs. 23-1-181, 23-1-301, 23-1-305, 23-1-309, 23-1-311, 23-1-313, 23-1-314, 23-1-315 am'd.
Sponsors
Sen. Gerald Dial [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-26 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-26 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2014-105. |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-02-26 | House | Signature Requested |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2014-02-26 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 431 |
2014-02-26 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2014-02-25 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-02-20 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Transportation, Utilities and Infrastructure |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 431 |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Commerce, Transportation, and Utilities |