AL SB34 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Pending third reading on day 18 Favorable from Children and Senior Advocacy
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Parental rights, provide that a conviction of a parent for rape or incest is a ground for termination of parental rights if the rape or incest resulted in the conception of the child, Secs. 12-15-312, 12-15-319 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Parental rights, provide that a conviction of a parent for rape or incest is a ground for termination of parental rights if the rape or incest resulted in the conception of the child, Secs. 12-15-312, 12-15-319 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-25 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Chambliss motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-08HousePending third reading on day 18 Favorable from Children and Senior Advocacy
2019-05-08HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2019-04-30HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Children and Senior Advocacy
2019-04-30SenateEngrossed
2019-04-25SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 412
2019-04-25SenateChambliss motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 411
2019-04-25SenateChambliss first Substitute Offered
2019-04-25SenateThird Reading Passed
2019-04-18SenateChambliss motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2019-04-18SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2019-04-11SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2019-03-05SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback