AL SB421 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-29 - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass lost Roll Call 1270
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-29 - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass lost Roll Call 1270
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Macon Co., bingo, may be played on electronic machines authorized by the National Indian Gaming Commission, const. amend.
Title
Macon Co., bingo, may be played on electronic machines authorized by the National Indian Gaming Commission, const. amend.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-29 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass lost Roll Call 1270 |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Lost in house of origin |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Reported from Committee |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Read for the second time and rereferred to committee Tourism |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |