AL SB48 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Public K-12 Education, posting of curricula on school websites required, parents or guardians authorized to examine materials upon request
Title
Public K-12 Education, posting of curricula on school websites required, parents or guardians authorized to examine materials upon request
Sponsors
Sen. Greg Reed [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-07 - House - Passed Second House (Y: 99 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - Instrument Change 98LQMMP-1 (Y: 99 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - Third Reading Second House (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Passed House Of Origin (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Singleton amendment 7PTMVVV-1 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Third Reading House of Origin (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - Instrument Change 98LQMMP-1 (Y: 99 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - Third Reading Second House (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Passed House Of Origin (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Singleton amendment 7PTMVVV-1 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Third Reading House of Origin (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | Senate | Enacted |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2024-03-19 | House | Signature Requested |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Enrolled |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Ready to Enroll |
2024-03-07 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 213 |
2024-03-07 | House | Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 212 98LQMMP-1 |
2024-03-07 | House | EP Reported Substitute Offered from House Education Policy 98LQMMP-1 |
2024-03-07 | House | Third Reading in Second House |
2024-02-28 | House | Committee Engrossed Substitute Adopted 98LQMMP-1 |
2024-02-28 | House | Committee Amendment Adopted TVCJ919-1 |
2024-02-28 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-02-28 | House | Reported Out of Committee Second House |
2024-02-08 | House | Pending House Education Policy |
2024-02-08 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Education Policy |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Engrossed |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 18 |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Singleton motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 17 7PTMVVV-1 |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Singleton Amendment Offered 7PTMVVV-1 |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Carried Over to the Call of the Chair |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Pending Senate Education Policy |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Education Policy |