AL SB72 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Off-label medical treatment; adverse action by occupational licensing board because of recommendation, prohibited; patient informed consent, required; cause of action, provided
Title
Off-label medical treatment; adverse action by occupational licensing board because of recommendation, prohibited; patient informed consent, required; cause of action, provided
Sponsors
Sen. Arthur Orr [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-05 - Senate - Passed House Of Origin (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - Melson substitution 8B7S2HF-1 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - Third Reading House of Origin (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - Melson substitution 8B7S2HF-1 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - Third Reading House of Origin (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-03 | House | Reported Out of Committee Second House |
2024-03-06 | House | Pending House Health |
2024-03-06 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Health |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Engrossed |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 170 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Melson motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 169 8B7S2HF-1 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | HLTH Substitute Offered 8B7S2HF-1 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted 8B7S2HF-1 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Pending Senate Healthcare |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Healthcare |