AL SB83 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy
Pending: House Education Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Education, boards of trustees, four-year institutions of higher education, newly appointed trustee or commissioner required to complete eight hours of professional development during first two years

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education, boards of trustees, four-year institutions of higher education, newly appointed trustee or commissioner required to complete eight hours of professional development during first two years

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-16 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Melson motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy
2019-04-18SenateEngrossed
2019-04-16SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 262
2019-04-16SenateMelson motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 261
2019-04-16SenateMelson Amendment Offered
2019-04-16SenateThird Reading Passed
2019-03-20SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2019-03-19SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education Policy

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback