AR HB1021 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-06 - Notification that HB1021 is now Act 287
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-06 - Notification that HB1021 is now Act 287
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning The Transportation Of Inmates In The Custody Of The Department Of Correction Or The Department Of Community Correction For Legal Proceedings.
Title
Concerning The Transportation Of Inmates In The Custody Of The Department Of Correction Or The Department Of Community Correction For Legal Proceedings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-04 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-08 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-08 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-06 | House | Notification that HB1021 is now Act 287 |
2013-03-04 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2013-03-04 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2013-03-04 | House | Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. |
2013-02-28 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1 |
2013-02-26 | House | Re-referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2013-02-26 | House | Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1 |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Returned To the House as passed as amended. |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-02-25 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2013-02-08 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-02-06 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-02-06 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-02-06 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-02-05 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2013-01-14 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2013-01-08 | House | Filed |