AR HB1138 | 2018 | 91st General Assembly Fiscal
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-06 - Notification that HB1138 is now Act 227
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-06 - Notification that HB1138 is now Act 227
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act For The Arkansas House Of Representatives - Staff Appropriation For The 2018-2019 Fiscal Year.
Title
An Act For The Arkansas House Of Representatives - Staff Appropriation For The 2018-2019 Fiscal Year.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-22 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | House | Notification that HB1138 is now Act 227 |
2018-03-01 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2018-03-01 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2018-03-01 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2018-02-22 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2018-02-20 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR. |
2018-02-20 | House | Filed |