WA HB1919 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-15 - Effective date 6/6/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-15 - Effective date 6/6/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Modifying the process by which a private moorage facility may sell an abandoned vessel for failure to pay moorage fees.
Title
Modifying the process by which a private moorage facility may sell an abandoned vessel for failure to pay moorage fees.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Bronoske [D] | Rep. Chris Corry [R] | Rep. Mari Leavitt [D] | Rep. Julia Reed [D] |
Rep. Steve Tharinger [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks: do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - House - House Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks: do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - House - House Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-15 | House | Effective date 6/6/2024. |
2024-03-15 | House | Chapter 110, 2024 Laws. |
2024-03-15 | House | Governor signed. |
2024-03-06 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | President signed. |
2024-03-04 | House | Speaker signed. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2024-02-19 | Senate | AWNP - Majority; do pass. |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks. |
2024-02-13 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2024-02-13 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-13 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2024-02-10 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2024-01-26 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2024-01-24 | House | AGNR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2024-01-24 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM. |
2024-01-17 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM. |
2024-01-08 | House | First reading, referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources. |
2023-12-11 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |