AR HB1150 | 2014 | 89th General Assembly Fiscal
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-19 - Failed on the Joint Budget Calendar at Sine Die Adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-19 - Failed on the Joint Budget Calendar at Sine Die Adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
An Act For The Department Of Human Services - Division Of Medical Services Appropriation For The 2014-2015 Fiscal Year.
Title
An Act For The Department Of Human Services - Division Of Medical Services Appropriation For The 2014-2015 Fiscal Year.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-20 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 72 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 68 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 70 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 68 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 70 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-19 | House | Failed on the Joint Budget Calendar at Sine Die Adjournment. |
2014-02-20 | House | Read the third time and failed. |
2014-02-19 | House | Read the third time and failed. |
2014-02-18 | House | Read the third time and failed. |
2014-02-13 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2014-02-13 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2014-02-13 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2014-02-13 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2014-02-10 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE |
2014-02-10 | House | Filed |