AR HB1251 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Failed on May 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-17 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Failed on May 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-17 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]
Summary
To Create The Partnership For Public Facilities And Infrastructure Act; And To Regulate Public-private Partnerships For Public Facilities And Infrastructure.
Title
To Create The Partnership For Public Facilities And Infrastructure Act; And To Regulate Public-private Partnerships For Public Facilities And Infrastructure.
Sponsors
Rep. Warwick Sabin [D] | Sen. David Sanders [R] | Rep. John Baine [D] | Rep. Scott Baltz [D] |
Rep. David Whitaker [D] | Rep. Eddie Armstrong [D] | Rep. Fonda Hawthorne [D] | Rep. George McGill [D] |
Rep. James McLean [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-02-22 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 61 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-17 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2013-04-03 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2013-02-22 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-02-20 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2013-02-18 | House | Re-referred to the Committee on CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2013-02-18 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-02-18 | House | Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-02-18 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-02-14 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-02-14 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-02-14 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-02-13 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2013-02-05 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2013-02-05 | House | Filed |