AR HB1258 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-02 - Notification that HB1258 is now Act 311
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-02 - Notification that HB1258 is now Act 311
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Law Concerning Membership And Vacancies On The Board Of Trustees Of The Arkansas Public Employees' Retirement System; And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
To Amend The Law Concerning Membership And Vacancies On The Board Of Trustees Of The Arkansas Public Employees' Retirement System; And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-23 - House - Senate amendment # 2 read and concurred in. (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-02 | House | Notification that HB1258 is now Act 311 |
2017-02-23 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2017-02-23 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2017-02-23 | House | Senate amendment # 2 read and concurred in. |
2017-02-22 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 2 |
2017-02-21 | House | Re-referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2017-02-21 | House | Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 2 |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Returned To the House as passed as amended. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-02-20 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 2 |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on SENATE COMMITTEE ON PUBLIC RETIREMENT AND SOCIAL SECURITY PROGRAMS. |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2017-01-30 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2017-01-30 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2017-01-25 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2017-01-24 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2017-01-24 | House | Filed |