AR HB1511 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-14 - Notification that HB1511 is now Act 407
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-14 - Notification that HB1511 is now Act 407
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
To Authorize Special License Plates For The Little Rock Air Force Base.
Title
To Authorize Special License Plates For The Little Rock Air Force Base.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Perry [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-12 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 79 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 79 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-14 | House | Notification that HB1511 is now Act 407 |
2013-03-13 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2013-03-12 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2013-03-12 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Transportation, Technology and Legislative Affairs |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2013-03-07 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-03-05 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2013-03-04 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-04 | House | Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-04 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-03-01 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-01 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-01 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-02-27 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE |
2013-02-27 | House | Filed |