AR HB1622 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-01 - Died in the House at Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-01 - Died in the House at Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Create A Procedure For Addressing Burdensome Requests For Disclosure; To Amend The Freedom Of Information Act Of 1967; To Create An Affirmative Defense; And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
To Create A Procedure For Addressing Burdensome Requests For Disclosure; To Amend The Freedom Of Information Act Of 1967; To Create An Affirmative Defense; And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-27 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 33 N: 32 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-16 - House - Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 69 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-16 - House - Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 69 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | House | Died in the House at Sine Die |
2017-03-27 | House | Read the third time and failed. |
2017-03-22 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2017-03-16 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-03-16 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2017-03-16 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2017-02-21 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2017-02-21 | House | Filed |