AR HB1654 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning The Rights Of Grandparents Involved With Foster Care And Adoption Cases.
Title
Concerning The Rights Of Grandparents Involved With Foster Care And Adoption Cases.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-13 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2017-03-13 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2017-03-09 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-03-09 | House | Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2017-03-09 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2017-03-08 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 2 |
2017-03-02 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-03-02 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2017-03-02 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2017-02-22 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2017-02-22 | House | Filed |