AR HB1706 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-16 - Notification that HB1706 is now Act 1275
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-16 - Notification that HB1706 is now Act 1275
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Definition Of Child Under The Child Welfare Agency Licensing Act; To Clarify The Meaning Of Foster Home; And To Make Clarifications To Other Provisions Of The Child Welfare Agency Licensing Act.
Title
To Amend The Definition Of Child Under The Child Welfare Agency Licensing Act; To Clarify The Meaning Of Foster Home; And To Make Clarifications To Other Provisions Of The Child Welfare Agency Licensing Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-11 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 84 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-04 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-04 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-16 | House | Notification that HB1706 is now Act 1275 |
2013-04-12 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2013-04-11 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2013-04-11 | House | Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. |
2013-04-10 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1 |
2013-04-04 | House | Re-referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2013-04-04 | House | Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1 |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Returned To the House as passed as amended. |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare and Labor |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2013-03-11 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-03-08 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2013-03-06 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2013-03-06 | House | Filed |