AR HB1894 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-11 - Notification that HB1894 is now Act 1159
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-11 - Notification that HB1894 is now Act 1159
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Require Licensed Child Care Facilities To File A Copy Of Their Facilities' Floor Plans With Local Offices Of Emergency Management And To Allow School Districts To File A Copy Of Their Floor Plans.
Title
To Require Licensed Child Care Facilities To File A Copy Of Their Facilities' Floor Plans With Local Offices Of Emergency Management And To Allow School Districts To File A Copy Of Their Floor Plans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-06 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-04 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-04 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-11 | House | Notification that HB1894 is now Act 1159 |
2013-04-09 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2013-04-08 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2013-04-08 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2013-04-06 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2013-04-06 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-04-06 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Education |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2013-04-04 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-04-03 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2013-03-25 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-25 | House | Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-25 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-03-11 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2013-03-08 | House | Filed |