AR HB2251 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning The Personal Information Protection Act; And To Define "encryption" In The Personal Information Protection Act.
Title
Concerning The Personal Information Protection Act; And To Define "encryption" In The Personal Information Protection Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-27 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Died on Senate Calendar at Sine Die adjournment. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Insurance and Commerce |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2017-03-27 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2017-03-22 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2017-03-07 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE |
2017-03-06 | House | Filed |