AR HCR1001 | 2012 | 88th General Assembly Fiscal
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-16 - House Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-16 - House Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
For A Joint Session Of The House Of Representatives And The Senate At 12:30 P.m., Monday, February 13, 2012, In The House Chamber, To Hear An Address By The Honorable Mike Beebe, Governor Of The State Of Arkansas.
Title
For A Joint Session Of The House Of Representatives And The Senate At 12:30 P.m., Monday, February 13, 2012, In The House Chamber, To Hear An Address By The Honorable Mike Beebe, Governor Of The State Of Arkansas.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-16 | House Approved by the Governor | |
2012-02-13 | House Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. | |
2012-02-13 | House TO BE ENROLLED | |
2012-02-13 | House Returned From Senate concurred in. | |
2012-02-13 | Senate Returned To the House as concurred in. | |
2012-02-13 | Senate Resolution read and concurred in. | |
2012-02-13 | Senate Rules suspended. | |
2012-02-13 | Senate Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar. | |
2012-02-13 | Senate Received from the House. | |
2012-02-13 | House Returned To Senate concurred in. | |
2012-02-13 | House Read and adopted and ordered transmitted to the Senate. | |
2012-02-13 | House Read the 3rd time. | |
2012-02-13 | House Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR. | |
2012-02-08 | House Prefiled |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2011/2012F/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=HCR1001 |
Text | http://arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2011/2012F/Bills/HCR1001.pdf |