AR HCR1013 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-7)
Status: Failed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-7)
Status: Failed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Encouraging The Expansion Of United States Route 69 North-south Corridor To Improve Accessibility And Create Economic Prosperity.
Title
Encouraging The Expansion Of United States Route 69 North-south Corridor To Improve Accessibility And Create Economic Prosperity.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Died on Senate Calendar at Sine Die adjournment. |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar. |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2017-03-08 | House | Read and adopted and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2017-03-07 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2017-03-06 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE |
2017-03-06 | House | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2017/2017R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=HCR1013 |
Text | http://arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2017/2017R/Bills/HCR1013.pdf |