AR HR1042 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-17 - READ AND ADOPTED.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

To Support Efforts To Preserve Fundamental Rights, Free Media, And Democratic Principles In Turkey; And To Recognize Turkish-american Citizens' Endeavors To Improve Ties Between The Great State Of Arkansas And Turkey.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Support Efforts To Preserve Fundamental Rights, Free Media, And Democratic Principles In Turkey; And To Recognize Turkish-american Citizens' Endeavors To Improve Ties Between The Great State Of Arkansas And Turkey.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-17HouseREAD AND ADOPTED.
2015-03-12HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2015-03-12HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2015-03-12HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2015-03-11HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
2015-03-10HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE
2015-03-09HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback