AR HR1045 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-18 - Resolution received unanimous support.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-18 - Resolution received unanimous support.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizing And Commending Dr. Cal Ledbetter For His Contributions To The State Of Arkansas And His Establishment Of The Endowment Entitled The "ualr Cal Ledbetter Arkansas Legislative Institute".
Title
Recognizing And Commending Dr. Cal Ledbetter For His Contributions To The State Of Arkansas And His Establishment Of The Endowment Entitled The "ualr Cal Ledbetter Arkansas Legislative Institute".
Sponsors
Rep. Ann Clemmer [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-18 | House | Resolution received unanimous support. |
2013-04-18 | House | READ AND ADOPTED. |
2013-04-12 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-04-12 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-04-12 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-04-11 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2013-03-12 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2013-03-11 | House | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2013/2013R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=HR1045 |
Text | http://arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2013/2013R/Bills/HR1045.pdf |