AR SB1 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly (Special)
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Passed on September 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-15 - Notification that SB1 is now Act 11
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Passed on September 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-15 - Notification that SB1 is now Act 11
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Create And Transfer Funds To The Arkansas Reserve Fund Set-aside In The Restricted Reserve Fund To Allow That Additional Funds May Be Made Available For State Departments, Agencies, And Institutions; And For Other Purposes.
Title
To Create And Transfer Funds To The Arkansas Reserve Fund Set-aside In The Restricted Reserve Fund To Allow That Additional Funds May Be Made Available For State Departments, Agencies, And Institutions; And For Other Purposes.
Sponsors
Sen. Jimmy Hickey [R] | Rep. Lane Jean [R] | Rep. Matthew Shepherd [R] | Rep. Les Eaves [R] |
Sen. Justin Boyd [R] | Sen. Steve Crowell [R] | Sen. Jonathan Dismang [R] | Sen. Jim Dotson [R] |
Sen. Ben Gilmore [R] | Sen. Bart Hester [R] | Sen. Ricky Hill [R] | Sen. Missy Irvin [R] |
Sen. Blake Johnson [R] | Sen. John Payton [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-09-14 - House - Third Reading (Y: 89 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-12 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-09-12 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-15 | Senate | Notification that SB1 is now Act 11 |
2023-09-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2023-09-14 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2023-09-14 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2023-09-14 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2023-09-14 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2023-09-14 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2023-09-13 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2023-09-12 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE |
2023-09-12 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2023-09-12 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2023-09-12 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2023-09-11 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2023-09-11 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2023-09-11 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to REVENUE & TAX - SENATE |
2023-09-08 | Senate | Filed |