AR SB128 | 2010 | 87th General Assembly Fiscal
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-26 - Senate Notification that SB128 is now Act 296
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-26 - Senate Notification that SB128 is now Act 296
Summary
An Act To Amend The Arkansas Revenue Stabilization Law Of Arkansas.
Title
An Act To Amend The Arkansas Revenue Stabilization Law Of Arkansas.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-26 | Senate Notification that SB128 is now Act 296 | |
2010-02-25 | Senate DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. | |
2010-02-25 | Senate Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. | |
2010-02-25 | Senate Returned from the House as passed. | |
2010-02-25 | House Returned To the Senate as passed. | |
2010-02-25 | House EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED | |
2010-02-25 | House Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. | |
2010-02-24 | House Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR. | |
2010-02-24 | House RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE | |
2010-02-24 | Senate Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. | |
2010-02-24 | Senate REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED | |
2010-02-24 | Senate ORDERED ENGROSSED | |
2010-02-24 | Senate EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED | |
2010-02-24 | Senate Read the third time and passed. | |
2010-02-24 | Senate Rules suspended. | |
2010-02-24 | Senate Considered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass. | |
2010-02-24 | Senate Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted. | |
2010-02-23 | Senate Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 | |
2010-02-18 | Senate Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Joint Budget Committee | |
2010-02-18 | Senate Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2009/2010F/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=SB128 |