AR SB178 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Delay The Inclusion Of A Score On The Writing Portion Of The Act Aspire Assessment In A Determination Of The Academic Performance Of A Student, Public School, Or Public School District.
Title
To Delay The Inclusion Of A Score On The Writing Portion Of The Act Aspire Assessment In A Determination Of The Academic Performance Of A Student, Public School, Or Public School District.
Sponsors
Sen. Jake Files [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-27 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Died in House Committee at Sine Die adjournment. |
2017-02-27 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2017-02-27 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2017-02-27 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Education |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Filed |