AR SB179 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #5) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #5) [PDF]
Summary
To Allow Reinstatement Of A Voluntarily Surrendered, Suspended, Or Revoked Educator's License Upon A Showing Of Rehabilitation And Fitness To Perform The Duties Authorized By The License.
Title
To Allow Reinstatement Of A Voluntarily Surrendered, Suspended, Or Revoked Educator's License Upon A Showing Of Rehabilitation And Fitness To Perform The Duties Authorized By The License.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Education |
2017-03-20 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Amendment # 5 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 5 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Education |
2017-03-14 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Amendment # 3 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 3 |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Education |
2017-03-01 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 2 |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Education |
2017-02-01 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Education |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2017/2017R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=SB179 |
Text | http://arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2017/2017R/Bills/SB179.pdf |