AR SB180 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: No history available
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: No history available
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning Nominating Petitions For Municipal Elections.
Title
Concerning Nominating Petitions For Municipal Elections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-04 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | Senate | |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Died in House Committee at Sine Die adjournment. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2019-04-24 | House | Returned to the Senate. |
2019-04-24 | House | Died on House Calendar at Sine Die Adjournment |
2019-02-25 | House | Re-referred to the Committee on CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2019-02-21 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-02-21 | House | Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2019-02-21 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2019-02-20 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 2 |
2019-02-19 | House | Re-referred to the Committee on CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2019-02-13 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-02-13 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2019-02-13 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2019-02-06 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2019-02-04 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2019-02-04 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Filed |