AR SB20 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-06 - Notification that SB20 is now Act 367
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-06 - Notification that SB20 is now Act 367
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning The Offense Of Aggravated Assault Upon A Certified Law Enforcement Officer Or An Employee Of A Correctional Facility; To Provide A More Serious Penalty For Knowingly Discharging A Firearm At A Law Enforcement Officer.
Title
Concerning The Offense Of Aggravated Assault Upon A Certified Law Enforcement Officer Or An Employee Of A Correctional Facility; To Provide A More Serious Penalty For Knowingly Discharging A Firearm At A Law Enforcement Officer.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Hendren [I] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-23 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-06 | Senate | Notification that SB20 is now Act 367 |
2017-02-27 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2017-02-23 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2017-02-23 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2017-02-21 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2017-01-24 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2017-01-24 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary |
2016-12-05 | Senate | Filed |